AL SB366 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on SB366 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Auburn University, board of trustees, selection process revised, Amendment 670, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auburn University, board of trustees, selection process revised, Amendment 670, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Love motion to Accede (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on SB366 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Love motion to Concur In and Adopt pending
2012-05-16 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1584
2012-05-16 Conference Report
2012-05-16 Love motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1593 House appoints Love, Beech and Gaston
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1477 Senate appts Marsh, Whatley, and Fielding .
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1567
2012-05-16 Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1566
2012-05-16 Holmes Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Mitchell intended to vote "No"
2012-05-16 Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1565
2012-05-16 Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1564
2012-05-16 Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2012-03-22 Engrossed
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2012-03-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 360
2012-03-22 Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 359
2012-03-22 Whatley Amendment Offered
2012-03-22 Marsh tabled Judiciary Substitute adopted Voice Vote
2012-03-22 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-20 Whatley to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-03-20 Judiciary first Substitute Offered
2012-03-20 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-02-23 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB366
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB366-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB366-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=433862&VOTE=359&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=433864&VOTE=360&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450246&VOTE=1564&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450247&VOTE=1565&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450249&VOTE=1566&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450252&VOTE=1567&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450427&VOTE=1477&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450787&VOTE=1593&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451127&VOTE=1584&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback