AL SB365 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-527.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-527.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rosa Parks Day, first day of December of each year, designated holiday, allow co. and municipality to observe, Sec. 1-3-8 am'd.
Title
Rosa Parks Day, first day of December of each year, designated holiday, allow co. and municipality to observe, Sec. 1-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-527. |
2018-03-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1054 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |