AL SB365 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama A & M University, board of trustees, nominating committee established, development of training program, at-large appointment may be from outside of Alabama, powers expanded, Secs. 16-49-20, 16-49-21, 16-49-23 am'd.; Sec. 16-49-25 repealed
Title
Alabama A & M University, board of trustees, nominating committee established, development of training program, at-large appointment may be from outside of Alabama, powers expanded, Secs. 16-49-20, 16-49-21, 16-49-23 am'd.; Sec. 16-49-25 repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Bill Holtzclaw [R] | Sen. Shadrack McGill [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Sen. Paul Sanford [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Sandford request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 735 | |
2011-05-25 | Sanford first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |