AL SB363 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales tax revenue, distribution of portion to Conservation and Natural Resources Dept for State Parks, adjustment based on change in Consumer Price Index, Sec. 40-23-35 am'd.
Title
Taxation, sales tax revenue, distribution of portion to Conservation and Natural Resources Dept for State Parks, adjustment based on change in Consumer Price Index, Sec. 40-23-35 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
HB566 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.