AL SB363 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, Alabama Unborn Child Protection from Dismemberment Abortion Act, prohibits and punishes person performing unless necessary to prevent serious health risk to mother

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, Alabama Unborn Child Protection from Dismemberment Abortion Act, prohibits and punishes person performing unless necessary to prevent serious health risk to mother

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Butler motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-397.
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 888
2016-05-04HouseButler motion to Table adopted Roll Call 887
2016-05-04HouseHall Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2016-04-26SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 801
2016-04-26SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-26SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-26SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback