AL SB362 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State parks, Alabama State Parks Enhancement Authority created and authorized to issue bonds for support of state parks, const. amend.
Title
State parks, Alabama State Parks Enhancement Authority created and authorized to issue bonds for support of state parks, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund with 1 amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
HB565 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:27 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 12 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 12 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |