AL SB362 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
Pending: House Mobile County Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
Pending: House Mobile County Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., county commission, composition, referendum
Title
Mobile Co., county commission, composition, referendum
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 446 | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3 |