AL SB361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:13 p.m. on March 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:13 p.m. on March 15, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., gas tax proceeds required to pay off debt obligations for Shoals Economic Development Project, Sec. 45-17-90.52 am'd.
Title
Colbert Co., gas tax proceeds required to pay off debt obligations for Shoals Economic Development Project, Sec. 45-17-90.52 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:13 p.m. on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 789 |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |