AL SB361 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-486.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-486.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School hiring, nepotism prohibited, Sec. 41-1-5 am'd.
Title
School hiring, nepotism prohibited, Sec. 41-1-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 45 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 45 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-486. |
2015-06-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1321 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1233 |
2015-06-02 | House | Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1232 |
2015-06-02 | House | Henry Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1231 |
2015-06-02 | House | Rich Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1230 |
2015-06-02 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2015-06-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 699 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |