AL SB361 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School Board Governance Improvement Act, to require public affirmation of board members to certain principles of educational governance, to require training and continuing education of city and county boards of education, Secs. 16-8-1, 16-11-2 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Board Governance Improvement Act, to require public affirmation of board members to certain principles of educational governance, to require training and continuing education of city and county boards of education, Secs. 16-8-1, 16-11-2 am'd

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-09 Indefinitely Postponed
2012-04-10 Brewbaker motion to Carry Over Temporarily Granted
2012-04-10 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-23 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback