AL SB360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public schools and colleges, grant all professional educators' associations same level of access to employees of public schools and colleges
Title
Public schools and colleges, grant all professional educators' associations same level of access to employees of public schools and colleges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Ross motion to Carry Over (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Shelnutt Amendment (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Ross motion to Table Shelnutt Amendment (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Shelnutt Amendment (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Ross motion to Table Shelnutt Amendment (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy |
2015-06-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1043 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Shelnutt Amendment adopted Roll Call 1042 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Further Consideration |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ross motion to Carry Over adopted Roll Call 1023 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ross motion to Table Shelnutt Amendment Lost Roll Call 1022 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Shelnutt Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |