AL SB359 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Assigned Act No. 2016-205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Assigned Act No. 2016-205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Madison, weed abatement as nuisance, notice, liens, foreclosure of property
Title
Madison, weed abatement as nuisance, notice, liens, foreclosure of property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-205. |
2016-04-26 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 731 |
2016-04-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 617 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Madison County |