AL SB357 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-320.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health, terminally ill patients, drugs and devices which have completed phase I trial, right to try under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, terminally ill patients, drugs and devices which have completed phase I trial, right to try under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-320.
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled
2015-05-28HouseSignature Requested
2015-05-28SenatePassed Second House
2015-05-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
2015-05-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2015-05-05SenateEngrossed
2015-04-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 686
2015-04-30SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 685
2015-04-30SenateWard first Substitute Offered
2015-04-30SenateWard motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-04-30SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-04-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB357
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB357-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB357-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB357-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=514463&VOTE=685&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=514464&VOTE=686&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=523060&VOTE=1134&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback