AL SB352 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-386.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic Beverage Control Board, manufacturer licenses, sale of liquor produced on site for off-premises consumption, amount increased, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control Board, manufacturer licenses, sale of liquor produced on site for off-premises consumption, amount increased, Sec. 28-3A-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 71 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-386.
2018-03-21SenateEnrolled
2018-03-21HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-21HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-21SenateHolley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 968
2018-03-21SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-21HouseHanes intended to vote "Abstain"
2018-03-21HouseHanes intended to vote "Abstain"
2018-03-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 956
2018-03-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 955
2018-03-21HouseEconomic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered
2018-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 810
2018-03-15SenateHolley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 809
2018-03-15SenateHolley first Substitute Offered
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-13SenateHolley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB352&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB352-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB352-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193102-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596198&VOTE=809&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596199&VOTE=810&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598821&VOTE=955&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598822&VOTE=956&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599092&VOTE=968&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597243&VOTE=851&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597244&VOTE=852&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590701&VOTE=477&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600611&VOTE=1156&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback