AL SB352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hollywood, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales
Title
Hollywood, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-154. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 589 |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 551 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |