AL SB35 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence, protection orders, definitions clarified, notice of hearing and service of process requirements clarified, fines and penalties for violations clarified, Sec. 13A-6-139.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-142, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5, 30-5-8 am'd.
Title
Domestic violence, protection orders, definitions clarified, notice of hearing and service of process requirements clarified, fines and penalties for violations clarified, Sec. 13A-6-139.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-142, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5, 30-5-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary |
2017-05-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 978 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 977 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scofield Amendment Offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 976 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |