AL SB35 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Judiciary fourth Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Judiciary fourth Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Secondary metals recycler, additional records to be maintained, purchases of specified metal property limited, registration with ACJIC, required, database of metal property sales created, criminal penalties, purchase of specified metal property prohibited, Secs. 13A-8-30 to 13A-8-37, inclusive, 13A-8-39 am'd; Secs. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-31.2, 13A-8-35.1, 13A-8-37.1, 13A-8-37.2 added (2012-20110)
Title
Secondary metals recycler, additional records to be maintained, purchases of specified metal property limited, registration with ACJIC, required, database of metal property sales created, criminal penalties, purchase of specified metal property prohibited, Secs. 13A-8-30 to 13A-8-37, inclusive, 13A-8-39 am'd; Secs. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-31.2, 13A-8-35.1, 13A-8-37.1, 13A-8-37.2 added (2012-20110)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Judiciary fourth Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Judiciary second Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Judiciary fifth Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Judiciary third Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Judiciary first Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Judiciary with 5 amendments | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 5 amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 170 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 169 | |
2012-02-23 | Blackwell Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Brooks to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair granted | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 136 | |
2012-02-23 | Brooks Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 135 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |