AL SB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard, facilities, access extended to certain veterans and their caregivers
Title
National Guard, facilities, access extended to certain veterans and their caregivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1089 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1088 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1088 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1089 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB416 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.