AL SB345 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-246.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture authority, counties authorized to establish, duties and powers, board of directors, loans authorized
Title
Agriculture authority, counties authorized to establish, duties and powers, board of directors, loans authorized
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Melson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-246. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Melson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 931 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799 |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 798 |
2017-05-04 | House | Greer Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 797 |
2017-05-04 | House | Agriculture & Forestry Substitute Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Greer motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Agriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 565 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 564 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 563 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 562 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |