AL SB344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2019-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2019-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., co. commission, county portion of proceeds from simplified seller use tax (SSUT), distrib. to local bds of ed.
Title
Morgan Co., co. commission, county portion of proceeds from simplified seller use tax (SSUT), distrib. to local bds of ed.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 74 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-272. |
2019-05-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 593 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |