AL SB344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-291.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., Alexandria, license commissioner and revenue commissioner, branch office, funding by co. gen. fund, other branch office authorized
Title
Calhoun Co., Alexandria, license commissioner and revenue commissioner, branch office, funding by co. gen. fund, other branch office authorized
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-291. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 791 |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 603 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |