AL SB344 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-395.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment compensation, employees of private companies providing direct service to schools, not eligible for benefits during school breaks, Sec. 25-4-70 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment compensation, employees of private companies providing direct service to schools, not eligible for benefits during school breaks, Sec. 25-4-70 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-395.
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 858
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 857
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2016-04-26SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826
2016-04-26SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-26SenateHoltzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-26SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback