AL SB342 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Harassment, by distributing a private image, defined, penalties, Sec. 13A-11-8 am'd.
Title
Harassment, by distributing a private image, defined, penalties, Sec. 13A-11-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 555 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |