AL SB342 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental Health Department, licensure for care or treatment for mental or emotional illness or individuals with a substance related disorder, non-clinical religious treatment excepted, Sec. 22-50-17 am'd. (2010-20348)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Department, licensure for care or treatment for mental or emotional illness or individuals with a substance related disorder, non-clinical religious treatment excepted, Sec. 22-50-17 am'd. (2010-20348)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - House - Motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 40 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 34 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - House - Bridges motion to Previous Question (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Further Consideration
2010-04-22 Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 1156
2010-04-22 Bridges motion to Table lost Roll Call 1155
2010-04-22 Bridges motion to Table adopted Roll Call
2010-04-22 Hilliard motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost
2010-04-22 Third Reading Carried Over
2010-04-22 Bridges motion to Previous Question lost Roll Call 1154
2010-04-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2010-04-08 Engrossed
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 764
2010-04-06 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 763
2010-04-06 Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Substitute Reported
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-11 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-02 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB342
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB342-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/SB342-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=385113&VOTE=763&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=385115&VOTE=764&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392353&VOTE=1154&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392356&VOTE=1155&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392357&VOTE=1156&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback