AL SB341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-445.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-445.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Medical Equipment Services Providers Board, insulin infusion pumps or glucose monitors, manufacturers and distributors exempt under certain conditions, Sec. 34-14C-5 am'd.
Title
Home Medical Equipment Services Providers Board, insulin infusion pumps or glucose monitors, manufacturers and distributors exempt under certain conditions, Sec. 34-14C-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-445. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1277 |
2015-06-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1139 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1138 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Health and Human Services Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |