AL SB340 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Assigned Act No. 2013-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Assigned Act No. 2013-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Agency, delivery of medical services to Medicaid eligible persons through regional care organizations, organization of a quality assurance committee, contracts with alternative care providers under limited circumstances, authorized
Title
Medicaid Agency, delivery of medical services to Medicaid eligible persons through regional care organizations, organization of a quality assurance committee, contracts with alternative care providers under limited circumstances, authorized
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-261. |
2013-05-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor |
2013-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1100 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 613 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 612 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 611 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Coleman Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 610 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 609 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Health first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 608 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 607 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 606 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Health Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 3 amendments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |