AL SB34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2022-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2022-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Etowah Co., board of registrars, working days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Title
Etowah Co., board of registrars, working days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 404 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 403 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 31 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Isbell motion to Adopt Roll Call 403 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 31 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-112. |
2022-03-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 404 |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |