AL SB34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Assigned Act No. 2015-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, circuit and districts, witnesses, video testimony authorize for members of Armed Services on active duty, requirements, Armed Services Accommodation Act, Sec. 12-21-135.1 added
Title
Courts, circuit and districts, witnesses, video testimony authorize for members of Armed Services on active duty, requirements, Armed Services Accommodation Act, Sec. 12-21-135.1 added
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-432. |
2015-06-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-06-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1218 |
2015-06-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 303 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |