AL SB337 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., Davis Lake Volunteer Fire Dept., organization as a fire district, levy of fee on each residence
Title
St. Clair Co., Davis Lake Volunteer Fire Dept., organization as a fire district, levy of fee on each residence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-265. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754 |
2017-05-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 714 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |