AL SB337 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-213.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-213.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., civic center authority, board members, appointments by Jefferson Co. Legislative Delegation, procedures, Act 547, 1965 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., civic center authority, board members, appointments by Jefferson Co. Legislative Delegation, procedures, Act 547, 1965 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 55 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-213. |
2015-05-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | House | Farley intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 790 |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 649 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County |