AL SB336 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, alcoholic beverages, off-premises sales authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 35-8B-3 am'd.
Title
Community development districts, alcoholic beverages, off-premises sales authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 35-8B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |