AL SB335 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-406.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, governing bodies, sales and use taxes, rules and regulations, prohibited from contracting with private auditing firms, Secs. 40-2A-3, 40-2A-6, 40-2A-12, 40-2A-13, 40-2A-14, 40-2A-15 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, governing bodies, sales and use taxes, rules and regulations, prohibited from contracting with private auditing firms, Secs. 40-2A-3, 40-2A-6, 40-2A-12, 40-2A-13, 40-2A-14, 40-2A-15 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-406.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-03HouseWhorton (I) intended to vote "Nay"
2016-05-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 834
2016-05-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2016-04-27SenateEngrossed
2016-04-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 860
2016-04-27SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 859
2016-04-27SenateCounty and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2016-04-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-03-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback