AL SB333 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Kitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Kitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., Personnel Board, apppointments, expense allowance of members, Secs. 45-48-121.03, 45-48-121.04 am'd.
Title
Marshall Co., Personnel Board, apppointments, expense allowance of members, Secs. 45-48-121.03, 45-48-121.04 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 848 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 847 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 847 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Kitchens motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 848 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
HB523 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 48 | 121.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 48 | 121.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |