AL SB333 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2014-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled substances, Schedule I, additional synthetic controlled substances and analogue substances included in, trafficking in controlled substance analogues, requisite weight increased, Secs. 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances, Schedule I, additional synthetic controlled substances and analogue substances included in, trafficking in controlled substance analogues, requisite weight increased, Secs. 13A-12-231, 20-2-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-184.
2014-03-13HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-13SenateEnrolled
2014-03-13SenatePassed Second House
2014-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 752
2014-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-02-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 397
2014-02-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-13SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-02-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback