AL SB332 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Corrections Dept., Dept. of Finance, purchasing division, to provide exemptions from purchasing requirements, Sec. 14-7-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections Dept., Dept. of Finance, purchasing division, to provide exemptions from purchasing requirements, Sec. 14-7-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HousePending third reading on day 30 Favorable from State Government
2017-05-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2017-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 960
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback