AL SB33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-378.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-378.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water utilities, nonprofit corps, not organized under Title 11, Code of Alabama 1975, audit by Examiners of Public Accounts under certain conditions
Title
Water utilities, nonprofit corps, not organized under Title 11, Code of Alabama 1975, audit by Examiners of Public Accounts under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1012 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 60 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 59 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 58 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 60 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 59 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 58 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-378. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1012 |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 60 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 59 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |