AL SB33 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Act No. 2020-57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Act No. 2020-57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Auctioneers, State Board of, sunset law review, subject to and continued to Oct. 1, 2024.
Title
Auctioneers, State Board of, sunset law review, subject to and continued to Oct. 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-57. |
2020-03-12 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-03-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 312 |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 174 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |