AL SB33 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, judges, Judicial Resources Allocation Commission, established, membership, duties, authority to increase or decrease judgeships under certain criteria
Title
Courts, judges, Judicial Resources Allocation Commission, established, membership, duties, authority to increase or decrease judgeships under certain criteria
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | House | Further Consideration |
2015-08-11 | House | England motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2015-08-11 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-08-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-08-06 | House | Rereferred from Judiciary to Ways and Means General Fund |
2015-08-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 32 |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |