AL SB326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on May 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coosa Co., judge of probate, fees for remote access of records, authorized, disposition of funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coosa Co., judge of probate, fees for remote access of records, authorized, disposition of funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateForwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on May 15, 2019
2019-05-15HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-15SenateEnrolled
2019-05-15SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 718
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 501
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback