AL SB325 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid, liens and claims against recipient and recipient's estate authorized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid, liens and claims against recipient and recipient's estate authorized

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseFurther Consideration
2017-05-19HouseRowe motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed
2017-04-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 685
2017-04-25SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 684
2017-04-25SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2017-04-25SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 683
2017-04-25SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback