AL SB324 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis, women of childbearing age, certain requirements established for medical cannabis use, Sec. 20-2A-64 am'd.
Title
Cannabis, women of childbearing age, certain requirements established for medical cannabis use, Sec. 20-2A-64 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services with 1 amendment |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare