AL SB324 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 3:24 p.m. on May 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Aliceville, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aliceville, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateDelivered to Governor at 3:24 p.m. on May 18, 2020
2020-05-18HouseSignature Requested
2020-05-18SenateEnrolled
2020-05-18SenatePassed Second House
2020-05-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 579
2020-05-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2020-05-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 620
2020-05-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-05-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-05SenateReferred to Committee
2020-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback