AL SB323 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2018-544.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education Trust Fund Rolling Reserve Act, Education Trust Fund Budget Stabilization Fund, authorize funds to be used for school security, Sec. 29-9-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Trust Fund Rolling Reserve Act, Education Trust Fund Budget Stabilization Fund, authorize funds to be used for school security, Sec. 29-9-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-544.
2018-03-29HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled
2018-03-29SenateSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-29HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1106
2018-03-29HouseHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-28SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1243
2018-03-28SenateExecutive Amendment Offered
2018-03-28SenateForwarded to Governor
2018-03-22HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled
2018-03-22SenatePittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1107
2018-03-22SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1013
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1012
2018-03-22HousePoole Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HousePoole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1011
2018-03-22HouseMotion to withdraw his amendment #2 adopted voice vote
2018-03-22HouseKnight Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseBrown 2nd Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-22HouseBrown motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22HouseBrown 1st Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1010
2018-03-22HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-03-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 795
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB323&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB323-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB323-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193574-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193834-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193834-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193867-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193843-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/194101-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595600&VOTE=795&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599901&VOTE=1010&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600137&VOTE=1011&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600142&VOTE=1012&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600183&VOTE=1013&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600432&VOTE=1107&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602471&VOTE=1243&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602787&VOTE=1106&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback