AL SB323 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licenses and licensing, Social Security number for license renewal repealed, Sec. 30-3-194 am'd
Title
Licenses and licensing, Social Security number for license renewal repealed, Sec. 30-3-194 am'd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-03 | Bussman motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |