AL SB322 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence, protection orders, definitions clarified, notice of hearing and service of process requirements clarified, fines and penalties for violations clarified, Sec. 13A-6-139.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-142, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5, 30-5-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence, protection orders, definitions clarified, notice of hearing and service of process requirements clarified, fines and penalties for violations clarified, Sec. 13A-6-139.1 repealed; Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131, 13A-6-132, 13A-6-134, 13A-6-138, 13A-6-142, 15-10-3, 15-13-190, 15-23-68, 30-5-2, 30-5-3, 30-5-5, 30-5-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HousePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 803
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB322&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB322-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595646&VOTE=803&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597298&VOTE=863&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597299&VOTE=864&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597300&VOTE=865&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597301&VOTE=866&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback