AL SB322 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community development districts, add'l type of district authorized, on lake originating from river in federal wilderness area, alcoholic beverages, add'l types of districts authorized in wet county for Sunday sales, resort property meeting certain criteria, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community development districts, add'l type of district authorized, on lake originating from river in federal wilderness area, alcoholic beverages, add'l types of districts authorized in wet county for Sunday sales, resort property meeting certain criteria, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-350.
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990
2017-05-18HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 989
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
2017-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 854
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-02SenateWaggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-04-27SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback