AL SB322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Severance tax on sand, gravel, etc., Revenue Department to provide county commissions with information regarding levy, collection, and distribution, audits authorized, civil penalties, counties authorized to collect, Secs. 40-13-53, 40-13-55, 40-13-56, 40-13-57, 40-13-58, 40-13-61 am'd
Title
Severance tax on sand, gravel, etc., Revenue Department to provide county commissions with information regarding levy, collection, and distribution, audits authorized, civil penalties, counties authorized to collect, Secs. 40-13-53, 40-13-55, 40-13-56, 40-13-57, 40-13-58, 40-13-61 am'd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-03 | Allen motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-03 | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |