AL SB321 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Rereferred from Calendar to ED&T
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Greene Co., bingo on electronic machines or devices authorized for licensed racetracks, Greene Co. Gaming Commission, established, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greene Co., bingo on electronic machines or devices authorized for licensed racetracks, Greene Co. Gaming Commission, established, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseRereferred from Calendar to ED&T
2019-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed
2019-04-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 473
2019-04-30SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 472
2019-04-30SenateTourism Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 471
2019-04-30SenateTourism Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-30SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-30SenateTourism Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenateTourism Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenatePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Tourism with 2 amendments
2019-04-25SenateReported from Committee
2019-04-23SenateRead for the second time and rereferred to committee Tourism
2019-04-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB321&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB321-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB321-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199924-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199840-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614181&VOTE=471&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614183&VOTE=472&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614184&VOTE=473&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback