AL SB320 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Toll roads and bridges, electronic assessment and collection of tolls, assessment to account holder or by photo-monitoring, administrative fees for nonpayment, judgements, suspension of driver's licenses and registration, Secs 23-2-165 to 23-2-175, inclusive, added; Sec. 23-2-163 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Toll roads and bridges, electronic assessment and collection of tolls, assessment to account holder or by photo-monitoring, administrative fees for nonpayment, judgements, suspension of driver's licenses and registration, Secs 23-2-165 to 23-2-175, inclusive, added; Sec. 23-2-163 repealed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2017-04-27SenatePittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-27SenatePittman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-27SenateTransportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback