AL SB320 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 870
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission
Title
Macon Co., bingo, may be played on electronic machines authorized by the National Indian Gaming Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 870 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 869 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Beasley first Substitute Offered |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Tourism and Marketing |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |